Steinbeck v. Suhr et al
Plaintiff: Leslie L. Steinbeck
Defendant: Jennie V. Suhr and SDR Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01561
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re: 23 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by SDR Contracting, Inc. Upon review of the Stipulated Motion and file in this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys fees. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/29/2010. (erv, )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SECOND ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 2/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/20/2010. (kmtcd, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Defendant Jennie V. Suhrs Rule 15 Motion to Amend Answer, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/2/09.(erv, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Dismissing Claim. 10 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claim Without Prejudice is granted, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/1/09. (gmssl, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 1/26/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/29/09. (kmtcd)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/7/09. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinbeck v. Suhr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie L. Steinbeck
Represented By: Shari R.L. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie V. Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDR Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?