Cleary Building Corp. v. Dame
Plaintiff: Cleary Building Corp.
Defendant: David A. Dame
Case Number: 1:2009cv01578
Filed: July 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/19/2010.(erv, )
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate February 1, 2010, Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2010 is VACATED and RESET to 2/11/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/27/2010. (mehcd)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Accordingly, Plaintiffs First, Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh claims for relief are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court retains jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Eighth, Ninth and Tenth Claims for Relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/1/09.(erv, )
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The settlement conference scheduled in this case for 11/30/2009, is vacated and rescheduled to 12/03/2009, at 1:30 p.m. Theconference will take place in Courtroom 203. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/28/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleary Building Corp. v. Dame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleary Building Corp.
Represented By: Eamonn Joseph Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Dame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?