Leibo v. Polar Electro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Beth Leibo
Defendant: Polar Electro, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01582
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Each party to pay their own costs and attorneys' fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/23/09. (jjh, )
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: On or before October 23, 2009, the parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/9/08. (bnbcd, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 the Defendants Second Unopposed Motion to Amend Answer to Add Separate Defense. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing Defendants Amended Answer, the attachment to docket no. 18, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/1/09.(bnbcd, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: granting 16 the Defendants Unopposed Motion to Amend Answer to Add Separate Defense. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing Defendants Amended Answer, the attachment to docket no. 16, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/29/09.(bnbcd, )
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/15/09. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leibo v. Polar Electro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Leibo
Represented By: Kimberly Elizabeth Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polar Electro, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick John Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?