Bowersox v. Board of County Commissioners for El Paso County, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Teena J. Bowersox
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for El Paso County, Colorado and El Paso County Department of Human Services
Case Number: 1:2009cv01601
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/13/10. (jjh, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Unopposed Motion to Modify 11 Scheduling Order. Date for completion of depositions is extended to and including October 15, 2010. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2010. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/15/2010.(rpmcd)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER For Calendar Call set 11/19/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch with Counsel to provide a joint statement when the case is called, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 09/09/10. (jjh, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Withdraw. George C. Price and the Law Offices of George C. Price have no further responsibility as counsel for the plaintiff in this action and the Clerk is directed to terminate electronic service for George C. Price in this case, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/1/2010.(rpmcd)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/15/2010 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 8, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/12/2010. (rpmcd)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Discharging 2 Order to Show Cause re: 4 Response, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/8/2010. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowersox v. Board of County Commissioners for El Paso County, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teena J. Bowersox
Represented By: George Case Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for El Paso County, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?