Heidinger v. County of Douglas, The et al
Plaintiff: Scott Heidinger
Defendant: County of Douglas, The, David (I) A. Weaver and David A. Weaver
Case Number: 1:2009cv01615
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND TO CLOSE CASE. The 56 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. All claims asserted in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in connection with this action. The Clerk shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/01/2010.(wjc, )
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Defendant CHM's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 13 is modified. Discovery due by 9/15/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/5/2010.(mjwcd)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint; Amended Complaint is accepted for filing as of the date of this order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/22/2009.(mjwcd)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/15/09. (msksec, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/20/09. (mskcd)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/14/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/17/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heidinger v. County of Douglas, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Heidinger
Represented By: Charles R. Crispell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Douglas, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) A. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?