Elliott v. Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation
Plaintiff: John Elliott
Defendant: Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv01641
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Motion to Amend Answer; Defendant Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation's Amended Answer is accepted for filing this date, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/17/2009.(mjwcd ) Modified on 12/17/2009 to correct linkage and edit text (wjc, ).
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 31 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Use a Conference Room, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/30/2009.(wjc, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/23/2009. (wjc, )
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. That the Subject Motion is GRANTED insofar as a Protective Order should be entered by the court. That the Subject Motion is DENIED insofar as Plaintiffs r equest to exclude the revisions requested by Defendant. The revisions to the written Protective Order as outlined in paragraph 5 in Defendants Response (docket no. 20 ) are appropriate and shall be included in the written Protective Order. That the written Protective Order is APPROVED as amended in paragraph 3 of this Order and made an Order of Court. That the parties shall file with this court on or before 10/21/2009, a revised written Protective Order that is consistent with this Order nunc pro tunc to 10/14/2009. That each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for this Subject Motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/14/09.(wjc, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/25/09. (msksec, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/20/09. (mskcd)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/14/2009 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/17/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Elliott
Represented By: Paul J. Maxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xtreme Coil Drilling Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?