Sisneros v. County of Pueblo et al
Plaintiff: George Sisneros
Defendant: County of Pueblo, Office of Pueblo County Sheriff, Kirk M. Taylor, Pueblo County Detention Center, Correctional Healthcare Management, Inc., City of Pueblo Colorado, The, Pueblo Police Department, James W. Billings, Jr., Ronald M. Oreskovich, Centura Health/St. Mary-Corwin Hospital of Pueblo, Colorado and Peter Elliot
Case Number: 1:2009cv01646
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER denying 206 Defendant Ronald M. Oreskovich's Motion for Entry of Judgment for Costs and Fees C.R.S. § 24-10-110(5)(c), as set forth in this order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/6/2012.(mjwcd)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER denying as moot 221 stipulated motion to dismiss with prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/26/11.(mnfsl, )
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER denying as moot the 215 , 216 stipulated motions to dismiss with prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/21/11.(mnf, )
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3), the remaining claims in this action, all of which arise under state law, are dismissed without prejudice. To the extent the Court reserved judgm ent on the 168 , 169 motion for summary judgment the motion is denied as moot. Plaintiff's 180 First Motion for Entry of Judgment and Certificate of Appealability is denied as moot. In accordance with this order and the 5/9/2011 order of the Court, judgment shall enter in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/8/11.(mnf, )
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting 181 Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) Witness Patricia Pacey, Ph.D., Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 (c). Patricia Pacey, Ph.D. is stricken as an expert witness for Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall be precluded from offering Dr. Pacey's testimony or her expert report at trial. Each party shall pay its own attorney fees and costs for this motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/25/2011.(mjwcd)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MINUTE ORDER. The Unopposed 196 Motion to Amend Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike is Granted as set forth in the subject motion, Page 2, Paragraph 4, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/12/11.(lsw, )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER. The 168 , 169 motion for summary judgment is granted in part. The Court grants summary judgment to defendant Taylor on plaintiff's § 1983 claims and reserves judgment on the state law claims addressed in the motion. All of plainti ff's claims against defendants Pueblo County Sheriff's Office and Pueblo County Sheriff's Detention Center are dismissed. On or before 5/19/2011, the parties may file briefs not exceeding five pages on the question of whether this Court can and should retain supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/9/11. (mnf, )
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER. Defendant Oreskovich's 139 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and the claims against defendant Oreskovich are dismissed, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/10/11.(mnf, )
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER accepting 125 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Denying 114 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend His Third Amended Complaint, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/22/10.(ebs, )
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MINUTE ORDER granting 136 Motion to Stay Discovery Based Upon Qualified Immunity. All discovery is stayed until ruling by Judge Brimmer on Motion for Summary Judgment 139 or until further Order of Court. All deadlines in the Scheduling Order are vacated. Joint Status Report due by 8/2/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/2/10.(ebs, )
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting 146 Defendant Correctional Healthcare Management, Inc.'s Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order Re: Depositions, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/21/10.(ebs, )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER. Defendant County of Pueblos motion to dismiss 110 is GRANTED in part and DENIED as moot in part. The County of Pueblo is dismissed with prejudice from this action. Defendant County of Pueblos request for a stay of discovery is deemed moot in light of its dismissal from this action. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/03/2010.(sah, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 53 Motion to Dismiss and 86 Motion to Dismiss Party. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/22/10.(pabsec)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER granting 90 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Second Amended Complaint; The tendered Third Amended Complaint [90-2] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/30/2009.(mjwcd )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 68 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint. The date this Order is entered shall be considered the date of filing of the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/30/09.(ebs, )
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/03/2009. (sah, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Re-Set September 18, 2009 Scheduling/Planning Conference; Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/04/2009.(mjwcd, )
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/22/2009. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisneros v. County of Pueblo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Sisneros
Represented By: Richard L. Tegtmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Pueblo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Pueblo County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pueblo County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Healthcare Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pueblo Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pueblo Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Billings, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald M. Oreskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centura Health/St. Mary-Corwin Hospital of Pueblo, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?