Mitchell v. Alcorn et al
Plaintiff: |
Elizabeth Mitchell |
Defendant: |
Thomas L. Alcorn, Lois Alcorn, Daniel Noven, Lee Kutner and Jeffrey Weinmann |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv01652 |
Filed: |
July 13, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Douglas |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Presiding Judge: |
Marcia S. Krieger |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fraud |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 8, 2010 |
Filing
57
Opinion and ORDER granting 9 Weinman's Motion to Dismiss based on subject matter jurisdiction. Complaint is dismissed in its entirety for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Remaining motions are denied as moot. Clerk to close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/8/10.(gms, )
|
January 28, 2010 |
Filing
49
MINUTE ORDER: granting 47 Motion for Leave to File Objection to PlaintiffsMotion for Joinder of Defendant and Leave to File Amended Complaint One Day Late, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/28/10.(bnbcd, )
|
December 3, 2009 |
Filing
31
TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/3/09. (msksec, )
|
December 2, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER: Supplemental Scheduling Conference set for 12/22/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall meet and prepare a single proposed scheduling order, which they shall submit to the court electronicall y on or before December 9, 2009. Deadline to complete Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: December 31, 2009 Deadline to join parties and amend pleadings: January 4, 2010. Discovery due by 6/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2010. Expert Disclosures: (a) The parties shall designate all experts and provide pro se parties and opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before April 1, 2010 (b) The parties shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide pro se parties and opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before April 30, 2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/2/09. (bnbcd, )
|
July 20, 2009 |
Filing
4
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/20/09. (mskcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?