Williams v. Purdy et al
Plaintiff: Sirrlove Williams
Defendant: Purdy, Dunn and Ronero
Case Number: 1:2009cv01661
Filed: July 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Discharging the 29 Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff to file his certified income account statement for the month of November on or before 3/15/10. Plaintiff remains obligated to make monthly payments, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/26/10. (gmssl, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE: Defendant's 27 Motion to Consolidate is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/24/10.(msksec, ) Modified on 2/26/2010 to correct the date filed. (gmssl, ).
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/28/09. (msksec, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/3/09. (mskcd)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE. This case shall be assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/25/2009. (sah, )
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to Proceed without of an Intial Partial Filing Fee by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/19/09. (jjh, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a 1915 motion on the proper court form along with a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/13/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Purdy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sirrlove Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?