Woodruff v. Wiley
Petitioner: Peter Woodruff
Respondent: Ron Wiley
Case Number: 1:2009cv01672
Filed: July 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal after Review re 19 Notice of Appeal by Peter Woodruff, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 10/20/09. (bjrsl, )
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of Dismissal. Notice of Opposition & Protest to the Assignment of This Case to a Magistrate Judge and to Judge Zita L. Weinshienk Due to Prejudice and Bias 10 , which the Court construes as a Motion to Recuse, is denied insofar as it seeks th is Court's recusal. Application is denied and action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. All other pending motions are denied as moot ( 4 Motion for Order, 5 Motion to Certify Class), by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 9/23/09.(gms, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Motion for Recusal 10 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/28/09. (jjhsl, )
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER denying as premature 5 Motion to Certify Class and for the Appointment of Counsel by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/17/09.(jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodruff v. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?