Zawadzki v. Community Hospital Association, The et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Zawadzki
Defendant: Community Hospital Association, The, People's Clinic, Kevin Dryden, Steven Holt, Ervyn Munks, Charles Jones, Catherine Ryan, Deborah Kern, Colleen Ryan, Philip Cambe and R. Winfield Hartley, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01682
Filed: July 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. A Stipulation of Dismissal 154 was filed on 12/21/2010. This matter shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own fees and costs. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/22/2010. (sah, )
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Withdrawal of Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement With Defendant United States of America 152 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion 148 is WITHDRAWN. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/02/2010.(sah, )
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER. A Stipulated Motion to Dismiss All Claims Between Plaintiff and Defendant Community Hospital Association,d/b/a Boulder Community Hospital (Only) 150 was filed on 10/29/2010. Defendant Community Hospital Association, d/b/a Boulder Community Hospital (only), be and is hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party yo pay his or her own costs. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/01/2010.(sah, )
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 134 Defendant United States' Rule 35 Motion for Independent Psychiatric Examination, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/21/2010. (mehcd)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant Boulder Community Hospital and granting 118 Defendant Boulder Community Hospital's unopposed Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit in Support of Response to Motion to Compel. Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under seal those document found at docket #119 until further order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/6/10.(lyg, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 123 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Re: Rule 35 Psychiatric Evaluation, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/27/2010. (mehcd)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER granting 111 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Rescheduling of Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 7/14/2010 is RESET for 9/17/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/11/2010. (mehcd)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 3/29/2010, taking under advisement 88 Defendant USA's Motion for Order to Compel an Independent Medical Examination. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. A Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Eryn Munks, M.D. 78 was filed on 01/25/2010. This matter shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Eryn Munks, M.D., only, each party to pay their own fees and costs. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 01/26/2010. (sah, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 55 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases. All future filings in these two actions will be made in Case No. 09-cv-01682-LTB-MEH with the caption as indicated above. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/19/2009.(sah, )
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. The Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice as it pertains to Philip Cambe, M.D., 79 is GRANTED, each party to pay their own fees and costs. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/07/2009. (sah, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 46 the Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice as it pertains to R. Winfield Hartley, Jr., M.D.. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/02/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zawadzki v. Community Hospital Association, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Zawadzki
Represented By: Lorraine Elizabeth Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Hospital Association, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People's Clinic
Represented By: Jamie L. Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Dryden
Represented By: Jamie L. Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Holt
Represented By: Jamie L. Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ervyn Munks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Ryan
Represented By: Jamie L. Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Kern
Represented By: Jamie L. Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Ryan
Represented By: Jamie L. Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Cambe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Winfield Hartley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?