Sardakowski v. Morgen et al
Plaintiff: James R. Sardakowski
Defendant: Gary Morgen and J. Willey
Case Number: 1:2009cv01687
Filed: July 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AFFIRMED and ADOPTED re 22 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge. Granting 20 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint WITH PREJUDICE. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/24/2010.(erv, )
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 MOTION to Dismiss 3 by Defendants Gary Morgen, J. Willey be GRANTED, and that this case be dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/25/2010. (kmtcd, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/11/09. (wydcd, rrk)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 3 Complaint filed by James R. Sardakowski by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/7/09. (erv, )
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. B Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/03/2009. (sah, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 28 U.S.C. 1915 Motion by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/27/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sardakowski v. Morgen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Sardakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Morgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?