Big O Tires, LLC et al v. Wilke et al
Plaintiff: Big O Tires, LLC and Big O Development, Inc.
Defendant: David Wilke and Linda Culver-Wilke
Case Number: 1:2009cv01696
Filed: July 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment 22 filed12/02/20009, is GRANTED on the terms stated in this order. On or before 04/26/2010 the defendants SHALL FILE with the court and serve on Big O a report, in writing and signed under oath, se tting forth in detail the manner and form in which they have complied with this order. Because this order grants permanent injunctive relief against the defendants, the plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Regarding Trademark, Telephone Number and Customer List 2 filed 07/17/2009, is DENIED as moot. On or before 05/05/2010, the plaintiffs SHALL FILE with the court a status report indicating the status of the plaintiffs remaining claims against the defendants and stating whether or not the plaintiffs intend to prosecute those claims further. Judgment SHALL ENTER accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/23/2010.(sah, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. This case is STAYED for ninety days; on or before 11/27/2009, the plaintiffs SHALL FILE a status report indicating the status of their motion for relief from stay in the bankruptcy court and whether they intend to withdraw or continue to prosecute their currently pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Regarding Trademark, Telephone Number and Customer List 2 filed 07/16/2009. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/28/2009. (sah, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 10/19/2009 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Shaffer on 8/24/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big O Tires, LLC et al v. Wilke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big O Tires, LLC
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big O Development, Inc.
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Culver-Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?