Logan v. Bunch et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence W. Logan
Defendant: Bunch, Potter, Sproul and Wiley
Case Number: 1:2009cv01704
Filed: July 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 66 filed 03/24/2010, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. The plaintiffs Instant Motion for Restraining Order 25 filed 09/30/2009, is DENIED as moot. The plaintiffs Motion for Investigation 37 filed 11/30/2009, is DENIED as moot. The plaintiffs Motion To Appoint Counsel 41 filed 12/28/2009, is DENIED as moot. The Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Brief in Support Thereof 57 filed 03/20/2010, is GRANTED. JUDGMENT S HALL ENTER in favor of the defendants, Mr. Bunch, Correctional Officer, Mr. Potter, Correctional Officer, Mr. Sproul, Unit Manager, and Mr. Wiley, Warden, against the plaintiff, Lawrence W. Logan. The defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. This case is DISMISSED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/23/2010.(sah, )
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: denying 12 Motion to Preserve Evidence, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/28/09.(bnbcd, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/23/2009. (sah, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Without Payment of Initial Partial Filing Fee by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/04/09. (jjh, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute ORDER denying as moot 7 Motion to Use Compulsory Process requesting that the Court direct prison staff to provide him with a certified copy of his trust fund account statement and to pick-up his outgoing mail by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/11/09.(jjh, )
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/16/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. Bunch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence W. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sproul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?