Trujillo v. Plough et al
Petitioner: John Gerald Trujillo
Respondent: Pam Plough and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2009cv01712
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 USCA ORDER re: 61 USCA Order. The appellant's petition for rehearing is granted for the limited purpose of amending the previously filed order. The amended order filed nunc pro tunc to 02/07/12 is attached. USCA case no. 11-1436. (bjrsl, )
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 53 Notice of Appeal by John Trujillo, appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/21/11. (bjrsl, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 50 Petitioner's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule 59(e), by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/12/11.(gmssl, )
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. the pro se Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 8 is DENIED. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. There is no basis on which to issue a certificate of appealability pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c). The Motion to Hold Respondents in Contempt of Court for Failure to Comply with a Court Order 37 is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/17/2011.(sah, )
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENTS TO PROVIDE REMAINING PORTIONS OF STATE COURT RECORD. Within ten days from the date of this order that the Respondents shall file with the clerk of this court, in electronic format if available, a copy of the complete reco rd of Mr. Trujillos state court proceedings in Case No 00CR2531, including all documents in the state court file and transcripts of all proceedings conducted in the state court, but excluding any physical evidence (as opposed to documentary evidence) not relevant to the asserted claims. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/21/2011. (sah, )
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER. The applicants Request For Extension of Time To File Traverse ToU.S. District Court 39 filed 3/23/2011, is DENIED. The applicants request 38 filed 3/23/2011, is GRANTED on the terms stated in this minute order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/24/2011.(sah, )
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. The respondents Motion for Reconsideration 19 field 01/14/2010, is DENIED. The Petitioners Amended Motion for Reconsideration 22 filed 01/27/2010, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/10/2010.(sah, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to Forward All Records and Transcripts. Clerk of the District Court of Jefferson County, Colorado, to forward the flat file and hearing transcripts for all proceedings in the trial court and the appellate court in 00CR2531 to the Clerk of this Court on or before 8/23/10. Clerk of U.S. District Court to serve a copy of this order on the Clerk of the Jefferson County District Court by mail and by fax, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/23/10. (gms, )
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Draw in Part and to Dismiss in Part. Claims 2(d), 2(e) and 2(g) are dismissed for the reasons states in this Order. Claim One and the remaining subparts of Claim Two, including (a),(b)(c),(f), (h), (i) and (j), shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer for Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 01/13/2010. (sah, )
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/18/09. (jjh, )
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER 4 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court is overruled. Ordered that Mr. Trujillo shall have 30 days to cure the deficiency by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 08/26/09. (jjh, )
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Application within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/23/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Plough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Gerald Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pam Plough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?