EMC Insurance Group, Inc. v. Western Skyways, Inc.
Plaintiff: EMC Insurance Group, Inc.
Defendant: Western Skyways, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01717
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order of Dismissal. A Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Action With Prejudice 102 was filed on 1/21/2011. This matter shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own fees and costs. This matter shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own fees and costs. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/24/2011. (sah, )
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate Related Cases, filed 01/19/2010 23 is GRANTED. This case is consolidated with Stephen Lawson v. Western Skyways, Inc. Case No. 09-cv-01165-LTB-BNB. Please see order regarding case caption. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 05/21/2010.(sah, )
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER : granting 34 Unopposed Amended Motion of Defendant Western Skyways to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/5/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2010. The parties shall designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before June 4, 2010. The parties shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before July 12, 2010. Settlement Conference reset for 6/2/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/12/10.(bnbcd, )
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 31 Unopposed Motion of Defendant Western Skyways to Modify Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/06/2010.(sah, )
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint 25 is GRANTED. The name of Plaintiff is changed from EMC Insurance Group to Employers Mutual Casualty Company, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/12/10.(ltbcd, )
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The parties shall submit a revised scheduling order on or before 12/22/2009, modified as discussed at the scheduling conference this morning. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/17/2009. (sah, )
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/4/09. (bnbcd, )
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER this case is transferred to Senior Judge Babcock as it is related to case no. 09-cv-1165-LTB. By Judge John L. Kane on 07/22/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMC Insurance Group, Inc. v. Western Skyways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMC Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Frank W. Coppola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Skyways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?