Harris et al v. Adams County Communications Center et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Harris, Elisabeth Stephenson and Gary Stephenson
Defendant: Adams County Communications Center, Adams County, Commerce City, Commerce City Police Department, Adams County Commissioner's Office, Shauna (I) Jenkins, Shauna Jenkins, Kevin (I) Lord, Kevin Lord, Jonathan (I) Lodge, Jonathan Lodge and Shaun Lutz
Case Number: 1:2009cv01728
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 OPINION AND ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment in its entirety. Judgment in favor of the Defendants shall enter contemporaneously with this Order, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/18/2010.(wjc, )
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER denying 130 Request for Dismissal of Parties or Claims with Leave to Refile the Motion and proposed order within 10 days, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 05/10/2010.(wjc, )
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 121 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants. The parties are directed to file a status report within ten days of the ruling on the Motion to Dismiss above referenced, or on 06/08/2010, whichever date first occurs. Discovery deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order [Doc. No. 65], as amended on 02/09/2010, are VACATED. This Order does not vacate or otherwise affect the scheduled Final Pretrial Conference set by the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/8/2010.(kmtcd, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/13/2009. (wjc, )
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Minute ORDER denying 73 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and the proposed Protective Order is REFUSED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/28/09.(kmtcd)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Minute ORDER denying 69 First MOTION for Order to change caption by Defendant Shaun Lutz. The court reminds Defendant of the duty to confer and cautions that future motions filed without conferring may be stricken by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/21/09.(kmtcd)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AMENDED TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Amended to include correct caption. Content remains the same as previous Trial Preparation Order at docket entry #67. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/19/09. (msksec, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/6/09. (mskcd)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/30/09. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Adams County Communications Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Harris
Represented By: Derry Dale Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Stephenson
Represented By: Derry Dale Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Stephenson
Represented By: Derry Dale Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Communications Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Commissioner's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna (I) Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin (I) Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan (I) Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?