Northwest Direct Teleservices, Inc. v. TouchStar Software Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Northwest Direct Teleservices, Inc. |
Defendant: |
TouchStar Software Corporation and Kayne Anderson Investment Management, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv01750 |
Filed: |
July 24, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 9, 2010 |
Filing
96
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff Northwest Direct Teleservices, Inc.s Unopposed Motion to Dismiss 95 filed 02/05/2010, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Release Preliminary Injunction Bond 83 filed 12/14/2009, is GRANTED. All other pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 08/06/2010, is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 08/23/2010, s VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/08/2010. (sah, )
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing
72
ORDER granting 62 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand [Doc. # 62-3], by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/12/09.(bnbcd, )
|
October 19, 2009 |
Filing
57
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/19/09. Seven (7) day Jury Trial set for 8/23/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/6/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
|
August 24, 2009 |
Filing
39
ORDER. In re 21 plaintiffs Motion For Temporary Restraining Orderand Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The motion for preliminary injunction is granted, and the motion for temporary restraining order is denied as moot.Plaintiff Northwest Direct Teleservices is to DEPOSIT with the Clerk of Court a bond in the amount of $5,000 (five thousand dollars). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/24/2009.(sah, ) Modified on 8/24/2009 to add language regarding the bond (sah, ).
|
August 20, 2009 |
Filing
38
STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding custody of exhibits. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/20/09. (rebcd)
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing
36
ORDER. The court ACCEPTS for filing the Receivers Statement with Respect To Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Limited Entry for Purpose of Contesting Jurisdiction 32 , filed 08/18/2009. The plaintiff S HALL FILE a reply to the Receivers Statement with Respect To Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion fro Preliminary Injunction and Limited Entry for Purpose of Contesting Jurisdiction on or before 1:00 PM on 08/20/2009. The Scheduling Order 29 is AMENDED to the limited extent necessary to facilitate and implement these orders. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/19/2009. (sah, )
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing
10
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/30/09. (bnbcd, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?