Creel v. iUniverse, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Catherine Creel
Defendant: iUniverse, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc., Buynow, Inc., Lulu Holdings, LLC, On-Demand Publishing LLC, Tino Georgiou and K. G. Glaub
Case Number: 1:2009cv01753
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction against Defendant Tino Georgiou (Georgiou), also known as K.G. Glaub, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/12/2010.(erv, )
January 25, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: granting 74 Unopposed Motion to Vacate or Set Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/25/10.(bnbcd, )
January 7, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 69 Renewed MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tino Georgiou, aka, K.G. Glaub filed by Catherine Creel. the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff file a sworn statement sufficient to support both an award of damages and injunctive relief. Such sworn statement may be provided via affidavit, unless Plaintiff would prefer to submit live testimony. Plaintiff has 30 days to file an affidavit or to request that the matter be scheduled for an evidentiary hearing. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/7/2010. (erv, )
December 23, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. The third paragraph of this Court's 12/21/2009 68 Order should be amended. See Minute Order for details, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/23/2009.(wjc, ) Modified on 12/28/2009 to add text as moot (wjc, ).
December 21, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER This matter is before the Court, sua sponte. On November 23, 2009, Plaintiff filed a motion titled Motion for Entry of Default in which she sought both a default and default judgment against Defendant Tino Georgiou a/k/a K.G. Glaub. 58 , On No vember 27, 2009, the Clerk of the Court entered default against Mr. Georgiou, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(a). Thus, Doc. 58 has been ruled upon. if Plaintiff seeks a judgment by default against Mr. Georgiou, she must file a separate motion which c omplies with the requirements of Colo.R.Civ.P. 55(b)(2). In addition, Plaintiff should submit a proposed form of judgment. After receipt of these documents, the Court will determine whether or not a hearing is necessary to effectuate the judgment. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/21/09.(erv, )
October 27, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting 51 Plaintiff's Renewed Unopposed Motion for leave to file second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the Second Amended Complaint [Doc. #51-2], by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/09.(bnbsec, )
October 22, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying without prejudice 48 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/22/09.(bnbcd, )
August 20, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/20/09. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creel v. iUniverse, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Creel
Represented By: David Akers Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iUniverse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buynow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lulu Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On-Demand Publishing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tino Georgiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. G. Glaub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?