Glaser v. Kentwood Company Cherry Creek, LLC, The et al
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Glaser
Defendant: Kentwood Company Cherry Creek, LLC, The, Rollie Jordan, Chubb Corporation, Colonial General Insurance Agency, Inc. and Great Northern Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv01758
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to C.R.S.§ 13-20-602(4) 81 , defendant's Partial Objections to April 21,2010 Minute Order Regarding Motions Hearing (Docket No. 110) Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 72 (a) 111 , defendan t's Forthwith Motion For Forthwith Order Regarding Defendant Jordan's Partial Objections to April 27, 2010 Minute Order Regarding Motions Hearing (Docket 110) 112 are DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Motion For Extension of Time to Respond To Defense Motions 127 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/09/2010.(sah, )
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motions Hearing held on 4/27/2010. Plaintiff failed to appear. Granting 94 Defendant's Renewed Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff shall appear for his deposition 5/3/2010 at 1:30 PM. Plaintiff shall bring responses to outstanding discovery. Failure to appear and/or bring responses may result in Court recommending this case be dismissed with prejudice and for additional sanctions. Defendant 9;s request for attorneys fees and costs is granted and defendant shall file itemized Affidavit by 5/7/2010; plaintiff may respond by 5/17/2010; Defendant may reply by 5/27/2010. Denying 105 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. Defendants Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant ToFed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion To Strike Pursuant ToFed.R.Civ.P. 12(f)(2) 39 filed 08/27/2009, is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/30/2010.(sah, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER granting 87 Defendant Rollie Jordan's Motion to Compel and Sanctions, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/24/2010.(mjwcd )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. Defendants Forthwith Motion for Stay of Execution of 12/22/2009 Order Regarding [Pro Se Plaintiffs] Motion To Compel Responses To Interrogatories (Docket No. 68) 80 filed 01/07/2010, is GRANTED. The requirements of the Order Regarding [Pro Se Plaintiffs] Motion To Compel Responses To Interrogatories (Docket No. 68) 75 filed 12/22/2009, are STAYED pending resolution of the defendants objections 76 to the order of the magistrate judge. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/08/2010.(sah, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. Douglas A. Glaser and Kentwood Company at Cherry Creek, LLCs Stipulation To Dismiss 77 filed 01/05/2010, is APPROVED. That plaintiffs claims against defendant, The Kentwood Company at Cherry Creek, LLC, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with the parties to bear their attorney fees and costs. That defendant, The Kentwood Company at Cherry Creek, LLC, is DROPPED as a party to this action, and the caption shall be amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/06/2010.(sah, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. The [Pro Se Plaintiffs] Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 68 is GRANTED. Defendant Rollie Jordan shall provide full and complete responses to Plaintiffs Interrogatories on or before 01/08/2010. The responses to such Interrogato ries may be used by the parties for the limited purpose of this lawsuit only and for no other purpose pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c). Each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for thismotion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/22/2009.(sah, )
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave to be Removed from CM/ECF Notification List for Case No. 09-cv-01758-REB-MJW Only. The clerk of the court shall remove Defendant Colonial General Insurance Agency, Inc.s counsel, Benjamin E. Tracey, from receiving further CM/ECF notifications from the court in this matter, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/09/2009.(wjc, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Jury Trial set for 8/23/2010 at 8:30 AM and Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/6/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/1/09. (rebcd)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The Joint Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice 44 filed 09/14/2009, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims against defendants Chubb Corporation, Colonial General Insurance Agency, Inc., and Great Northern Insurance Company, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees andcosts. Any pending motion filed on behalf of defendants Chubb Corporation, Colonial General Insurance Agency, or Great Northern Insurance Company, is DENIED as moot. Defendants Chubb Corporation, Colonial General Insurance Agency,Inc., and Great Northern Insurance Company are DROPPED as named parties to thislitigation, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/16/2009.(sah, )
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Kentwood Company of Cherry Creek, LLCs Motion to Quash Plaintiffs Subpoena Duces Tecum 8 and Defendant Kentwood Company of Cherry Creek, LLCs Motion to Quash Plaintiffs Subpoena Duces Tecum for Bank Records 9 are both GRANTED and the subpoenas duces tecum are quashed. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/19/2009.(sah, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/11/2009. (mjwcd )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: 13 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Case number was corrected. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/28/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaser v. Kentwood Company Cherry Creek, LLC, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentwood Company Cherry Creek, LLC, The
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Downer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rollie Jordan
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Corporation
Represented By: John D. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial General Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?