Chicago Insurance Company v. Hamilton et al
Plaintiff: Chicago Insurance Company
Defendant: Jan (I) B. Hamilton and Jan B. Hamilton
Case Number: 1:2009cv01815
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER denying 214 Defendant's Motion for New Trial; denying 215 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying 216 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Any further filings/motions in this matter may be stricken, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/4/2013. (eseam)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion to Clarify 196 - filed 09/13/2010 is DENIED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 09/14/2010.(sah, )
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER to Cure Deficiency. Defendant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or to file a 1915 motion, re 184 Notice of Appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/23/10. (gmssl, )
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER. Defendants motions 154 and 158 are DENIED. All motions previously filed and not ruled upon are DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 07/30/2010.(sah, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant, Jan B. Hamilton, Ph.D., President and CEO, Nutritional Biomedicine, Motion to Clarify Minute Order Denying and Striking the Pretrial Order 177 filed with the court on 07/26/2010, is granted. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/27/2010.(sah, )
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER. The recommendation 141 of the Magistrate Judge is accepted and Defendant. Jan B. Hamiliton Ph.D., President and CEO, Nutritional Biomedicine, Despostive [sic] Motion to Compel Plaintiff Chicago Insurance Company to Award Defendant All Damages and Reimbursement Shown in Monetary Recovery Document 133 is denied by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 06/18/10.(jjh, )
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 135 Plaintiff Chicago Insurance Companys Motion Seeking A Brief Extension to and/or Clarification Regarding the Courts Dispositive Motion Deadline Set for May 31, 2010. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2010. DENYING 136 Defendants, Jan B. Hamilton, Ph.D., President and CEO, Nutritionalbiomedicine, Motion to Compel Plaintiff Chicago Insurance Company to Award All Damages as Listed and Meet the May 31, 2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/28/2010.(mjwcd)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing held on 5/24/2010. Taking under advisement 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Taking under advisement 102 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. taking under advisement 127 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Taking under advisement 128 Defendants' Motion to Compel. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER granting 125 Defendants Motion to Clarify Minute Order 124 . A motions hearing is set before this court on 05/24/2010, starting at 9:00 a.m. and ending at an undetermined time in Courtroom A-502, Fifth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Cour thouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The courts agenda is that at that hearing it will hear oral argument on the motions docketedas 84 (motion for default judgment) and 102 (motion to compel). Defendant shall appear in person for that motions hearing.By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/21/2010.(sah, )
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER denying 117 Pro Se Defendant Ham B. Hamiltons Motion to Compel Plaintiff Chicago Insurance Companys Response to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/19/2010.(sah, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER.The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 101 is DENIED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 05/04/2010. (sah, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER. The pro se defendants Motion and Affidavit for Leaveto Proceed on request for Disclosure from Chicago Insurance Company Due to Family Emergency 71 is denied without prejudice. The pro se defendants Motion and Affidavit for Continuanc e Until [defendant] (or Ed Butler) finds an attorney 72 is denied. The pro se defendants Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Protection Order & Request to seek Dismissal of Aspen Housing Authority Notice to Quit & Eviction from Public Housing 73 is denied. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/22/2010.(sah, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER denying 53 Motion to File Criminal Theft, Coercion, Sabotage Against Individual Executives and Employees of Chicago Insurance Company, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/04/2009.(wjc, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 39 Notice of Appeal, by Jan Hamilton, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/05/09. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2009. Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendant Jan B. Hamiltons September 3, 2009, Filing (Document 10) 13 filed 09/04/2009, is granted as stat ed on the record. Documents 10 and 32 shall be sealed. The Defendants Motion to Stay 20 , filed 09/14/2009, is denied for the reasons as stated on the record. The Defendants Motion for Order 21 , filed 09/16/2009 is denied for the reasons as stated on the record. The Defendants Motion to Reset 28 filed 09/30/2009, is denied as moot. A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is schedule for 12/11/2009, at 1:30 p.m.. (Court Reporter Ginny Kramer.) (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicago Insurance Company v. Hamilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle D. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan (I) B. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan B. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?