Garcia v. Jones et al
Petitioner: Jasper L. Garcia
Respondent: Susan Jones, Aristedes Zavaras, A.G. and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2009cv01833
Filed: August 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO FORWARD ALL RECORDS AND TRANSCRIPTS. The Clerk of the Court for the District Court of the City and County of Denver, Colorado, as the lawful custodian of the records, shall forward the flat file and hearing transcripts for all proceedings i n the trial court and in the appellate court in People v. Garcia, Jasper Luke, Denver County District Court, Case No. 03CR2204, to the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, on or before 11/15/2010. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on the Clerk of the Court for the District Court of the City and County of Denver, by facsimile and by regular mail, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/14/2010. (wjc, )
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Draw In Part and to Dismiss In Part. Claim Two is dismissed for the reasons stated in this Order. Claims One and Three and this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/20/2009. (sah, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days of the filing of hte Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/25/09. (jjh, )
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Application within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/07/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jasper L. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Susan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?