Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC v. Massey Real Estate et al
Plaintiff: Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC
Defendant: Massey Real Estate, Consultants, RLLLP, Thomas W. Massey, Jr., Nicholas J. Cortese and Rebecca F. Massey
Case Number: 1:2009cv01861
Filed: August 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii). The complaint, all claims and counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 1/14/10. (ebs, )
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER resetting hearing pursuant to a telephonic request made by counsel. ORDERED that a Scheduling Conference will be held on 12/3/2009, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/9/09. (cbssec)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 11/3/2009 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/27/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC v. Massey Real Estate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Edward R. Spalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massey Real Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consultants, RLLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Massey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas J. Cortese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca F. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?