Berry v. Colorado Precast Concrete, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fred H. Berry
Defendant: Colorado Precast Concrete, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01890
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/4/2010. (kmtcd, )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/19/2010. (kmtcd, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 6/14/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and proposed pretrial order due by 4:00 p.m. 5/27/2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/16/2010. (rpmcd)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER For Calendar Call set 4/16/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A with counsel to provide a joint statement when the case is called, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/28/2010. (rpmcd)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/23/2009 11:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on October 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/2/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Colorado Precast Concrete, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred H. Berry
Represented By: Hugh S. Pixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Precast Concrete, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?