Griffin v. Lang et al
Plaintiff: Robert C. Griffin, Jr.
Defendant: Fred Lang and Jefferson County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 1:2009cv01891
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND TO CLOSE CASE. Any and all claims asserted in the above captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys fees incurred in connection with this action. The Clerk shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 01/29/2010. (wjc, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/17/09. (msksec, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/3/09. (mskcd)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 11/17/2009 at 9:15 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Shaffer on 8/25/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Lang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?