Denning v. Allied Interstate, Inc.
Plaintiff: Matthew Denning
Defendant: Allied Interstate, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01935
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to the 22 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/30/09. (ebs, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/17/2009. (The parties are reminded that they will be required to comply fully with all provisions of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2, and particularly those provisions dealing with filing documents under seal.)(cbscd)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER sua sponte resetting Scheduling and Settlement Conference to 11/17/2009, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/21/09. (cbssec)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Scheduling and Settlement Conference on 11/16/2009 at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/2/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denning v. Allied Interstate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Denning
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Interstate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?