USA v. D'Andrea et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Joni K. D'Andrea, Howard Mitchell Gilbert and Cendant Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv01940
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Correct Omission in Judgment. An amended judgment shall enter in favor of the United States and against defendant Joni DAndrea in the amount of $61,379.77, plus interest. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/19/13.(dkals, )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. The 83 Renewed Motion to Dismiss United States' Remaining Claimfor Foreclosure, which the Court construes as a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(5), is granted. Gilbert and PCSU are relieved from the 9/29/2010 judgment. The United States may not foreclose on the subject property. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/9/11.(mnfsl, )
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER re: 81 Joint Motion to Dismiss Remaining Claim With Prejudice. To the extent a claim survived the judgment, it was dismissed with prejudice as of the filing of the joint motion to that effect signed by all the remaining parties. No further action is necessary, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/6/11.(ebs, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER accepting 73 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Denying 31 Defendant Howard Mitchell Gilbert's Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying 33 Defendant Public Service Credit Union's Motion for Summary Judgment. Denyin g 42 Defendant Joni K. D'Andrea's Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting 58 Plaintiff United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff United States of America's objection 43 to the United States Magistrate Judge's 2/19/10 Minute Order 40 is denied as moot, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/27/10.(ebs, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER granting 66 United States' Unopposed Motion to Vacate Pre-Trial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference 8/16/2010 08:30 AM is vacated; Deadline fo submission of proposed pretrial order 8/11/2010 is vacated. Granting 70 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the United States. Attorney Shayla Laura McCormally terminated. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/3/2010.(mjwcd)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER accepting 55 Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. The 52 Motion for Entry of Default on Defendant Howard Mitchell Gilbert's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs for the motion, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/10/2010.(wjc, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE Michael J. Watanabe, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/10/09. (ebs, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/28/2009. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. D'Andrea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Shayla Laura McCormally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni K. D'Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Mitchell Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cendant Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?