Haynes v. Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angela Haynes
Defendant: Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01956
Filed: January 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that Plaintiffs remaining state law claim for wrongful discharge in violation of public policy, and this case, shall be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3). ORDERED that the final trial conference set for Monday, 04/18/11 at 4:00 p.m., and the five- day jury trial set to commence Monday May 2, 2011, are vacated by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/11/11. (jjh, )
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. Ordered that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 38 is Granted in Part and Denied in Part as set forth in this Order by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/31/11.(jjh, )
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6). Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/9/11.(wydcd, rrk)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER : the parties shall submit on or before November 16, 2010, a revised proposed final pretrial order, modified as discussed, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/8/10. (bnbcd, )
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE Order. Based on Notice to Clerk, this case should be Unsealed, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/25/10. (gmssl, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/9/09. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Haynes
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Walter Vernon Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?