State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Burwell et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Jane Burwell, Estate of Bud Bivens and Estate of Kjerstie Anderson
Case Number: 1:2009cv01965
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to the 49 Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice. This matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/2/10. (ebs, )
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re: 47 Stipulated Agreement. The Court accepts the stipulated facts. Dismissal Paper due by 7/8/2010, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/29/10. (ebs, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/29/2010. (mjwcd)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Defendant Burwell's Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and For an Extension of Time Within Which to Complete Discovery. Discovery due by 4/16/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/22/2010.(mjwcd )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/28/2009. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Burwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Franklin D. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Bud Bivens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Kjerstie Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?