Fleming v. Camacho et al
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Fleming
Defendant: (I) Camacho, Camacho, (I) Curtis, Curtis, (I) Ternansky, Ternansky, (I) Johnson, Johnson, (I) Sears, Sears, (I) Kellar and Kellar
Case Number: 1:2009cv01972
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 158 The Parties Stipulated Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own attorneys fees and costs. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/28/2010.(erv, )
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MINUTE ORDER withdrawing 150 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by the Untied States of America since this case was settled at the settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Watanabe on 12/9/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/15/2010.(mjwcd)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER granting 152 Stipulated Motion for Leave for Plaintiff to File Fourth Amended complaint. The Fourth Amended Complaint [152-1] is accepted for filing as of the date of this order. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/14/2010.(erv, )
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Settlement Conference held on 12/8/2010. Settlement reached as to individual defendants Dr. C. L. Polland and Ronald Camacho. Dismissal Papers as to indi vidual defendants due by 2/28/2011. Stipulated Motion to Amend Complaint and a proposed Fourth Amended Complaint with Joseph J. Fleming as plaintiff and United States of America as defendant due no later than 2/28/2011. Denying as moot, without prejudice, 88 Defendants' Motion for Involuntary Dismissal. Denying as moot, without prejudice, 140 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by Dr. Polland. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER granting 136 Pro Se Plaintiff's Second Motion for Extension of Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure Deadline. There will be no further extensions of time for expert disclosure. Rule 16 Scheduling Order 69 is amended consistent with this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/4/2010.(mjwcd)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER granting 99 plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint to the extent that the tendered Fourth Amended Complaint [99-1; shall be filed as of the date of this Minute Order as the THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT , and with defendant Unknown Supervisor, ADX stricken from the caption and body of the pleading. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/23/2010.(erv, )
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re: 102 the Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order of Magistrate Judge Watanabe filed July 16, 2010. it is ORDERED that the recommendation made by Magistrate Judge Watanabe in the Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order of July 16, 2010 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. Defendant Unknown Supervisor, ADX Florence is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; (I) Curtis terminated. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/2/2010. (erv, )
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting 122 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Complete his Deposition and for Expedited Consideration, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/2010. (mjwcd)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER withdrawing 92 . Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion to FileThird Amended Complaint Under F.R.Civ. Proc.[sic] 15(c)(2) is moot and therefore is withdrawn. The Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff has subsequently filed a new Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint Late 99 and therefore docket no. 92 is MOOT, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/29/2010.(mjwcd)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER granting 86 Defendants' Motion to Compel. The Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff has failed to file any response to the subject motion 86 and this court deems the subject motion confessed. Accordingly, it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff shall provide to the Defendants his Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures on or before August 16, 2010. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/22/2010.(erv, )
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER Denying Withouyt Prejudice 82 Plaintiff's Motion to file Third Amended Complaint Under F.R. Civ. Proc. 15(c)(2); It is further ORDERED that the deadline for amendment of pleadings is extended up to and including June 30, 2010; Granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re 42 Second Amended Complaint C. L. Polland answer due 7/13/2010; C. (I) L. Polland answer due 7/13/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/15/2010.(erv, )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 54 Defendants Camacho and Curtis' Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of plaintiff at the Federal Correctional Institution - Fort Worth, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/15/2010.(mjwcd)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER granting 48 Defendants' Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference and to Amend Docket Number 45. Scheduling Conference set 4/19/2010 09:30 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 4/21/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Incarcerated plaintiff shall appear by telephone. Proposed Scheduling Order due no later than 4/15/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/1/2010.(mjwcd )
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/5/2010. (erv, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Plaintiff's Motion to File Second Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(c)(2). The Second Amended Complaint [38-2] is accepted for filing as of the date of this minute order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/2/2010.(mjwcd )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Motion to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/7/09.(erv, )
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DRAWING CASE. Ordered that this case be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/30/2009. (sah, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Plaintiff to file amended complaint within 30 days, re: 3 Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/25/09. (gmssl, )
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/18/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Camacho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Ternansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ternansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Kellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?