Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund et al v. Whitney Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan, Trustees of Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund & Annuity Plan, Eighth District Electrical Benefit Trust Fund, Trustees of Eighth District Electrical Benefit Trust Fund, Denver Joint Electrical Apprentice and Training Committee and Trustees of Denver Joint Electrical Apprenticeship and Training Committee
Defendant: Whitney Electric Company and Craig Whitney
Case Number: 1:2009cv02001
Filed: August 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Costs. Defendants, Whitney Electric Company and Craig Whitney, jointly and severally, shall pay Plaintiffs' reasonable costs in the total amount of $525.70, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/15/10.(mnf, )
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 48 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Plaintiffs' 48 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Summary Judgment is entered in favor of the Plaintiffs and against Whitney Electric Company on Claim 1 pursuant to 29 U.S. C. §§ 1132 and 1145 in the amount of $701,285.25, to bear interest as provided by law. Summary Judgment is entered in favor of the Plaintiffs and against Craig Whitney on Claim 2 in the amount of $57,879.59, to bear interest as pr ovided by law, for which sum he is jointly liable with Whitney Electric Company. The Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 11/24/2010 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. The 54 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Postpone Final Pretrial Conference is DENIED, as moot. Plaintiffs shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to request an award of attorney fees, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/19/2010.(wjc, )
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/10/09. (msksec, ) (Correct pdf added on 11/12/2009: # 1 Main Document) (gmssl, ). Modified on 11/12/2009 to add correct pdf. (gmssl, ).
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 10/21/2009, at 9:15 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/4/09. (cbssec)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/3/09. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund et al v. Whitney Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund & Annuity Plan
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eighth District Electrical Benefit Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Eighth District Electrical Benefit Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Joint Electrical Apprentice and Training Committee
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Denver Joint Electrical Apprenticeship and Training Committee
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?