Murray v. Hautzinger et al
Plaintiff: Carey A. Murray
Defendant: Pete Hautzinger and John Suthers
Case Number: 1:2009cv02021
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. The Magistrate Judge's Recommendation is correct and order anew that the action is dismissed. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/27/2010.(sah, )
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. Plaintiffs Response and Objection to, Grant the DefendantsMotion to Dismiss 49 is STRICKEN. In the alternative, I would conclude that the Magistrate Judges Recommendation is correct. Under either conclusion, it is therefore ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc 31) is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED.By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 09/10/2010. (sah, )
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The recommendation is accepted and Defendants Motion to Dismiss 31 is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 09/02/2010.(sah, )
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER denying withoutprejudice 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Add Parties, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/8/2010.(mjwcd)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Add All Relevant Parties to this Action[sic], by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/2/2010.(mjwcd )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/12/2010. (sah, )
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendants Colo. Board of Parole, Division of Adult Parole and John Suthers are dismissed as parties to this action. The Clerk of Court is to remove Colo. Board of Parole, Division of Adult Probation and John Suthers as parties to this action. The only remaining Defendant is Tasha Dobbs. Claim Seven is dismissed without prejudice. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/16/2009. (sah, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER denying 10 Motion to Stay. The Court will grant Mr. Murray an additional 15 days to file his Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/09/09.(jjh, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/06/09. (jjh, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Without Payment of Initial Partial Filing Fee by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/17/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Hautzinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey A. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Hautzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?