Strothers v. P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Louis Randall Strothers
Defendant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02027
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own attorneys fees and costs. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/26/2010. (erv, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Stipulated Motion to Vacate The Settlement Conference set on May 18, 2010, at 2:30 p.m.; The parties will participate in outside mediation on June 17, 2010, at 9:00 a.m., with Kathryn Miller from Littleton Alternative Dispute Resolution. The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 6/23/2010. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/12/2010.(erv, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Stipulated Motion to Modify Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set 3/9/2010 10:00 AM is vacated. Settlement Conference reset for 5/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/8/2010.(mjwcd )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/12/2010. (mjwcd)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/5/2009. (mjwcd )
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/21/2009. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strothers v. P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Randall Strothers
Represented By: Diane Smith King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?