Hernandez v. Castle Rock Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wilfrido Hernandez
Defendant: Castle Rock Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02029
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff on all claims. Defendant may have its costs, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/02/2011.(wjc, )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/20/2010. (kmtcd, )
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/3/09. (msksec, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/1/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/2/09. (kmtcd)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RESETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference reset for 12/1/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/21/09. (kmtcd)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/2/09. (mskcd)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2009 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/28/09. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Castle Rock Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfrido Hernandez
Represented By: Jennifer C. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Rock Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?