Diamond Rose Shears, LLC v. Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diamond Rose Shears, LLC
Defendant: Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein and Chris McCarley
Case Number: 1:2009cv02035
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Boyd N Boland
Referring Judge: David M Ebel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2010 Filing 51 REPORT on the determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (jak, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The stipulation of the parties is APPROVED. This civil action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall pay its own costs and attorneys' fees. By Judge David M. Ebel on 04/16/2010. (sah, )
April 9, 2010 Filing 49 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Diamond Rose Shears, LLC, Defendants Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein, Chris McCarley. (Amberly, Vincent)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER granting #45 Unopposed Motion for Copy of Transcript. A transcript is to be provided UNDER SEAL. The parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a) on or before 04/09/2010, or a status report. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/04/2010.(sah, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM regarding #45 MOTION for Order to filed by Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Judge David M. Ebel on 03/04/2010. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(sah, )
March 4, 2010 Filing 46 Docket Annotation re: #45 MOTION for Order to. Entry modified to change event into a motion pursuant to request from chambers. Text only entry - no document attached (sah, )
March 4, 2010 Filing 45 (Unopposed Motion For Copy of Transcript) Settlement Agreement Extension of Time and Transcript Request by Plaintiff Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. (Event changed into a Motion for Order)(Amberly, Vincent) Modified on 3/4/2010 to change event into a motion (sah, ).
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. The parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), if at all, on or before 03/08/2010. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/22/2010. (sah, )
February 22, 2010 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Settlement Conference held on 2/22/2010. The parties shall file a motion or stipulated to dismiss on or before 03/08/2010. (sah, )
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. The Motion for Oral Arguments on Defendants Motions to Dismiss #40 is DENIED for failure to comply with District of Colorado Local Rule 7.1(a) (Duty to Confer) . By Judge David M. Ebel on 01/26/2010.(sah, )
January 15, 2010 Filing 41 RESPONSE to #40 First MOTION for Hearing/Conference on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein, Chris McCarley. (Kannady, Scott)
January 8, 2010 Filing 40 First MOTION for Hearing/Conference by Plaintiff Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. (Hagen, Glenn)
December 31, 2009 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint filed by Defendants Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein, Chris McCarley. (Kannady, Scott)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and defendants have to and including December 31, 2009, in which to file their replies to the Motions to Dismiss (docket nos. 21, 22 and 23), by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/28/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (bnbsec, )
December 28, 2009 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM regarding #36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Chris McCarley, Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge David M. Ebel on 12/28/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(jjh, )
December 28, 2009 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint by Defendants Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein, Chris McCarley. (Kannady, Scott)
December 14, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance For Plaintiff by Vincent M. Amberly on behalf of Diamond Rose Shears, LLC (Amberly, Vincent)
December 11, 2009 Filing 34 BRIEF in Opposition to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint filed by Plaintiff Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. (Hagen, Glenn)
December 11, 2009 Filing 33 Docket Annotation re: #31 Brief in Support of Motion. Counsel will re-file using the Brief in Opposition to Motion event. Text only entry - no document attached (sah2, )
December 11, 2009 Filing 32 DECLARATION of WL Laney regarding Brief in Support of Motion, #31 by Plaintiff Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. (Hagen, Glenn)
December 11, 2009 Filing 31 BRIEF in Support of #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint filed by Plaintiff Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. (Hagen, Glenn)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting #28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Verified Complaint. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motions to Dismiss on or before 12/11/2009. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/10/2009.(sah, )
December 10, 2009 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM regarding #28 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Com filed by Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Judge David M. Ebel on 12/10/2009. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(sah, )
December 9, 2009 Filing 28 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint by Plaintiff Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hagen, Glenn)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/4/09. (bnbcd, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER: re: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/21/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/4/09. (bnbcd, )
December 4, 2009 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2009. Discovery due by 4/5/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 5/5/2010. Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/21/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei.) (bnbcd, )
November 30, 2009 Filing 24 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. (Hagen, Glenn)
November 20, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Plaintiff's Verified Complaint by Defendant Chris McCarley. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished case, #2 Unpublished case)(Kannady, Scott) Modified on 11/23/2009 to create linkage (sah2, ).
November 18, 2009 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Plaintiff's Verified Complaint by Defendant Jonathan Klein. (Kannady, Scott) Modified on 11/19/2009 to create linkage (sah2, ).
November 18, 2009 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Plaintiff's Verified Complaint by Defendant Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC. (Kannady, Scott) Modified on 11/19/2009 to create linkage(sah2, ).
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint. Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC answer due 11/18/2009; Jonathan Klein answer due 11/18/2009; Chris McCarley answer due 11/20/2009, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/29/2009.(wjc, )
October 29, 2009 Filing 19 Docket Annotation re: #16 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint. This docket entry was modified to edit text to clarify the title of this document. Text only entry - no document attached (ebs, )
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint filed by Chris McCarley, Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein, and #16 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint filed by Chris McCarley, Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Judge David M. Ebel on 10/29/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (ebs, )
October 29, 2009 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC.. (Kannady, Scott)
October 29, 2009 Filing 16 Proposed Order for #15 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint by Defendants Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein, Chris McCarley. (Kannady, Scott) Modified on 10/29/2009 to edit text to clarify the title of this document (ebs, ).
October 29, 2009 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Verified Complaint by Defendants Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein, Chris McCarley. (Kannady, Scott) Modified on 10/30/2009 create linkage (wjcsl, ).
October 28, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Brown & Kannady, LLC by Scott Thomas Kannady on behalf of all defendants (Kannady, Scott)
October 21, 2009 Filing 13 Docket Annotation re: #8 Summons Returned Unexecuted. This docket entry was modified to alter the text to reflect the title of this document and to correct the filer to be the plaintiff. Re: #9 Summons Returned Executed. This docket entry was modified to correct the filer to be only the plaintiff, to remove service information for defendants Klein and Hattori Hanzo Shears and to correct the service date for Mr. McCarley. Re: #10 Summons Returned Executed and #11 Summons Returned Executed. These docket entries were modified to correct the filer to be only the plaintiff and to add the service information and answer deadline for each defendant. Text only entry - no document attached (gms, )
October 20, 2009 Filing 12 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC answer due 10/29/2009; Jonathan Klein answer due 10/29/2009. Entry done to correct the answer deadlines, pursuant to the returns of service filed as documents #10 and #11 on 10/20/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (gms, )
October 20, 2009 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by plaintiff. Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC served on 10/9/09, answer due 10/29/09. (Hagen, Glenn) Modified on 10/21/2009 to correct the filer to be only the plaintiff and to add the service information and answer deadline for this defendant. (gms, ).
October 20, 2009 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by plaintiff. Jonathan Klein served on 10/9/09, answer due 10/29/09 (Hagen, Glenn) Modified on 10/21/2009 to correct the filer to be only the plaintiff and to add the service information and answer deadline for Mr. Klein. (gms, ).
October 20, 2009 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by plaintiff. Chris McCarley served on 10/11/2009, answer due 11/2/09. (Hagen, Glenn) Modified on 10/21/2009 to correct the filer to be only the plaintiff, to remove service information for defendants Klein and Hattori Hanzo Shears and to correct the service date for Mr. McCarley (gms, ).
October 20, 2009 Filing 8 Notice of Proof of Service by plaintiff as to Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein, Chris McCarley. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Proof of Service)(Hagen, Glenn) Modified on 10/21/2009 to alter the text to reflect the title of this document and to correct the filer to be the plaintiff. (gms, ).
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/16/09. (bnbcd, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/9/09. (bnbcd, )
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge David M. Ebel on 8/31/09. (gms, )
August 26, 2009 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (jak, )
August 26, 2009 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. (jak, )
August 26, 2009 Filing 2 Verification by Plaintiff Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. (jak, )
August 26, 2009 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT against Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC, Jonathan Klein, Chris McCarley ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 21511) Summons Issued, filed by Diamond Rose Shears, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(jak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Rose Shears, LLC v. Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Rose Shears, LLC
Represented By: Glenn W. Hagen
Represented By: Vincent M. Amberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hattori Hanzo Shears, LLC
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Klein
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris McCarley
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?