Dougherty v. Tyler Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deanna Dougherty
Defendant: Tyler Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02057
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/8/10. (msksec, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2009 is vacated and reset to 1/20/2010 09:45 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/2/2009. (mehcd)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/2/09. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dougherty v. Tyler Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Dougherty
Represented By: Rosemary Orsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?