NRC Broadcasting, Inc. v. Cool Radio, LLC et al
Plaintiff: NRC Broadcasting, Inc.
Defendant: Cool Radio, LLC, Thomas Dobrez and Gabrie Higbie
Case Number: 1:2009cv02076
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/23/09. (cbssec)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/10/09. Three (3) day Jury Trial set for 8/30/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/13/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 11/10/2009, at 10:45 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/20/09. (cbssec)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 2 plaintiffs Motion For Temporary Restraining Order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/14/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NRC Broadcasting, Inc. v. Cool Radio, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRC Broadcasting, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cool Radio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dobrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabrie Higbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?