Gutierrez v. Bronco Drilling Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LeJon Gutierrez
Defendant: Bronco Drilling Company, Inc. and Mutual Assurance Administrators, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02082
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Las Animas
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/29/2010. (sah, )
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/8/10. (cbssec)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Vacate and resetting Scheduling Conference to 1/5/2010, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/3/09.(cbssec)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 11/6/2009, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/22/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Bronco Drilling Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeJon Gutierrez
Represented By: Gary P. Sandblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bronco Drilling Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Assurance Administrators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?