American International Insurance Company v. Central Sprinkler Company
Plaintiff: American International Insurance Company
Defendant: Central Sprinkler Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv02098
Filed: September 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/21/11. (mnf, )
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Five-day Jury Trial set for 12/12/2011 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/2/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/2/11. (mnf, )
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 4/15/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/1/11. (mnf, )
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: granting in part [47 Motion for Protective Order; Motion Hearing held on 6/22/2010. That all documentation consistent with today's order shall be produce on or before July 13, 2010. (Court Reporter FTR: Ginny Kramer) (gkram)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SECOND ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/22/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/6/2010. (kmtcd, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 29 MOTION for Leave to to File Third-Party Complaint by Defendant. The Clerk of Court shall file Defendants Third Party Complaint(Doc. No. 295). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/31/2010.(kmtcd, )
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Minute ORDER granting 35 Motion to Withdraw Brandon K. Gutshall as Counsel for Defendant, Central Sprinkler Company. The Clerk of Court is instructed to remove Mr. Gutshall from the electronic certificate of mailing by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/25/2010.(kmtcd, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 4/12/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/2/09. (kmtcd)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/4/09. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American International Insurance Company v. Central Sprinkler Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American International Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah Earle Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Sprinkler Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?