Reck v. Regional Transportation District et al
Plaintiff: Tom Reck
Defendant: Regional Transportation District, Global Access, LLC and Special Transit
Case Number: 1:2009cv02100
Filed: September 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re: 62 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. All claims are dismissed with prejudice. All parties shall pay their own costs and attorney's fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 11/17/10.(ebs, )
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Minute ORDER granting 36 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Answer to Complaint by Defendant. The Clerk of Court shall file the Amended Answer attached to Defendant Regional Transporation Districts motion (#36-2) by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/5/2010.(kmtcd, )
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/21/2010. (kmtcd, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/30/09. (ebs, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute ORDER granting 17 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Tom Reck. Scheduling Conference reset for 1/21/2010 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/19/09.(kmtcd)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/9/09. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reck v. Regional Transportation District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Reck
Represented By: Diane Vaksdal Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Transportation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Access, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?