Williams v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Lannie Williams
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2009cv02101
Filed: September 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER on Remand. re: 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Assign the Case Upon Remand to an ALJ Who Did Not Previously Hear the Case. The ALJ's determination that Plaintiff is not disabled is reversed and matter is remanded for further proceedings. Court recommends that the Commissioner assign this matter to a new ALJ on remand, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/24/11.(gmssl, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 2/23/2011, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/11. (gmssl, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 2/25/2010. SS Defendants Brief due by 3/25/2010. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 4/5/2010, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/21/09. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lannie Williams
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?