Schwartz v. Frantz et al
Plaintiff: Robert Schwartz
Defendant: Paula Frantz and Aristedes Zavaras
Case Number: 1:2009cv02127
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADOPTS 47 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. granting 41 Motion to Dismiss; All claims against all Defendants are DISMISSED; Plaintiffs Claim Three is barred by the doctrine of collateral estoppel and is there fore DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 4. Plaintiffs § 1983 claim for monetary damages against Defendants in their official capacities is barred by the Eleventh Amendment and is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/29/2011.(erv, )
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal re: 32 Amended Complaint, filed by Robert Schwartz by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/30/2010. (erv, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motions Hearing held on 4/16/2010 DENYING 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint. GRANTING 15 Motion to Add, Amend and Supplement his Previous ly Filed 28 U.S.C. 1983 [sic] Complaint. Plaintiff shall file Amended Complaint on or before 5/17/2010. DENYING 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief; DENYING 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery of Plaintiff's Medical Records and Copies Thereof at No Cost to Plaintiff, and Only to be Used for Submission to This Court. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal re: 3 Complaint filed by Robert Schwartz by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/18/09. (erv, )
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE. Ordered that this case shall be assigned to District Judge Christine M. Arguello, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/15/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartz v. Frantz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?