Reynolds v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joseph Reynolds
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv02143
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, in its entirety, each party to pay his or its own attorneys fees and costs through and including the date of this Order. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/4/2010. (erv, )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER Settlement Conference reset for 2/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/14/2010. (mjwcd )
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/16/2009. (mjwcd) (Modified on 9/17/2009 corrected to Novemeber for the Hearing Month)(erv, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Reynolds
Represented By: Beth Andrea Tomerlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael S. Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?