Home Design Services, Inc. v. Peters
Plaintiff: Home Design Services, Inc.
Defendant: Thomas M. Peters
Case Number: 1:2009cv02156
Filed: September 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant Christopher Krabacher. Ordered that plaintiff's complaint against defendant Christopher Krabacher is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own fees and costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/29/10. (jjh, )
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Thomas M. Peters 24 . Ordered that plaintiff's complaint against defendant Thomas M. Peters is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own fees and costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/08/10. (jjh, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint-Injunctive Relief Sought is accepted for filing by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/21/09.(jjh, )
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 11/16/2009, at 9:15 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/16/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Design Services, Inc. v. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Design Services, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony M. Lawhon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?