Cerda v. Global Credit & Collection Corporation
Plaintiff: Jose Cerda
Defendant: Global Credit & Collection Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv02169
Filed: September 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE approving the 28 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. This matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/23/09. (ebs, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 6 Motion to Dismiss, entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/6/09.(wydcd, rrk) Modified on 10/6/2009 to add the word "Minute" as the beginning of the text. (gmssl, ).
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting Scheduling and Settlement Conference on 12/14/2009, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/22/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cerda v. Global Credit & Collection Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cerda
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Credit & Collection Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?