Ward v. Hoyer
Plaintiff: David Lenton Ward
Defendant: Craig Hoyer
Case Number: 1:2009cv02204
Filed: September 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/15/10. (jjh, )
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER granting 85 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Confidential Settlement Agreement and Motion to Reopen Plaintiff's Title VII Action Civil Action No. 09-cv-02204-PAB-MJW. Withdrawing 82 Motion to Vacate and Motion to Reopen Civil Action, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/1/10.(ebs, )
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER denying 75 Plaintiff's Opposed Objections to Court Ruling/Minute Order of January 22/2010 [Document #69] Based on the Grounds Previously Asserted (And Cited Below) by Plaintiff for the Purpose(s) of Motion for Reconsideration by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe Concerning Matters Involved in Such Minute Orders, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/4/10.(ebs, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER denying 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Each party to pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/3/2010.(mjwcd )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER: Denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion for All Relief Requested in Plaintiff's Complaint; Denying without prejudice 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(C); Denying 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment for All Relief Requested in Plaintiff's Complaint as Filed in the Court September 4, 2009. Plaintiff shall comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(A). Each party shall bear its own costs and fees with respect to these motions, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/22/2010.(mjwcd)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice 41 Plaintiff's Motion/Request for Reconsideration of Court Order/Ruling of December 18th, 2009 Ruling, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/14/2010.(mjwcd )
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER denying 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Court Order (Minute Order) (Docket No 34) dated December 16th, 2009, and Court Order (Minute Order) (Docket No. 41) Dated December 22nd, 2009, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/30/2009.(mjwcd )
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2009. Granting 28 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for a Status Conference;Granting in part and denying in part 32 Plai ntiff's Motion/Notice of His Objection to Stipulation Regarding Dismissal of Craig Hoyer and Substitution of Kubat as the Correct Defendant With Prejudice (Instead of Without Prejudice) and Defendant's Submission of Revised Unopposed Scheduling Order and proposed Stipulation of Dismissal and Substitution of Defendant. Defendant shall submit a Scheduling Order for the Court's signature by 05:00 PM 12/21/2009. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller.) (mjwcd )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2009. Discovery due by 5/3/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 6/7/2010. Settlement Conference set for 2/19/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/2/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Granting 21 Plaintif f's Motion and/or Demand for Jury Trial Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 38. On or before 12/11/2009, parties shall file a Joint Motion to Dismiss Craig Hoyer, individually, as defendant and a Joint Motion to Substitute Kubat Equipment and Service Company as defendant. Parties shall submit a Scheduling Order in its final form for the Court's signature on or before 12/11/2009. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/20/2009. (mjwcd )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/30/2009. (sah, )
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a a signed complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/14/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lenton Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?