December 13, 2012 |
Filing
197
ORDER Affirming 185 Report and Recommendations: 171 Motion for Injunctive Relief is denied, and 177 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is denied as moot. 172 Motion for Leave to Submit Affidavit, 175 Motion for Leave to Supplement Motion for Injunctive Relief, and 178 Motion to Further Supplement Motion for Injunctive Relief are granted. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/13/12.(dkals, )
|
December 3, 2012 |
Filing
192
ORDER and Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Plaintiff by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/3/12. (dkals, )
|
November 30, 2012 |
Filing
190
ORDER granting 184 MOTION for Subpoena and service by the United States Marshal by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/30/12. (dkals, )
|
September 16, 2012 |
Filing
167
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. The above-captioned matter has been rescheduled for a five-day jury trial on the docket of Judge Christine M. Arguello in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A602, 6th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on 12/17/2012 at 9:00 AM, in Courtroom A602. A Final Trial Preparation Conference is set for 11/30/2012, at 9:00 AM. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/16/2012. (cmacd)
|
February 10, 2012 |
Filing
150
ORDER AFFIRMING 1/19/12 ORDER OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion for Summary Judgment; affirming and adopting 147 Report and Recommendations. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/10/12.(jjpsl, )
|
August 1, 2011 |
Filing
133
ORDER Plaintiffs objections 131 are OVERRULED and the Magistrate Judges Order denying Plaintiffs Motion to Compel 127 is AFFIRMED. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/1/2011. (erv, )
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing
129
MINUTE ORDER denying 127 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/14/2011.(erv, )
|
June 17, 2011 |
Filing
126
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 124 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and/or 124 Motion to Stay Proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff seeks to compel Defendants to produce discov ery in relation to properly propounded discovery requests, he shall file a Motion to Compel no later than July 15, 2011. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to any Motion to Compel that is not summarily denied on or before fourteen (14) days of its filing. No reply shall be permitted. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/17/2011.(erv, )
|
April 6, 2011 |
Filing
112
MINUTE ORDER denying 110 Plaintiffs pleading titled Unethical Conduct on Court Ordered Deposition Sanctions, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/6/2011.(erv, )
|
January 28, 2011 |
Filing
92
MINUTE ORDER Granting 87 Plaintiff's Motion for Order. Only one piece of mail was returned as undeliverable to Plaintiff between December 24, 2010 to January 19, 2011, the Courts Order and Recommendation on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Rest raining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction 83 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail a copy of Docket No. 83 to Plaintiff; Denying 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Order seeking a new packet of § 1983 forms to start over my civil rights complaint and to amend my recently submitted complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to the case manager for Plaintiff at the Centennial Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 600, Canon City, CO 81215-0600. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/28/2011.(erv, )
|
December 7, 2010 |
Filing
82
MINUTE ORDER granting 79 Defendant Jones Motion for Leave to Take Plaintiffs Deposition. Defendant Jones is permitted to depose Plaintiff at a date and time agreeable to the parties and the prison. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/7/2010.(erv, )
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing
72
MINUTE ORDER denying 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Order compelling CCF case management to furnish Plaintiff or the Court a monthly account statement and/or 20% of any funds placed in his prison account. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to the case manager for Plaintiff at the Centennial Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 600, Canon City, CO 81215-0600. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/19/2010.(erv, )
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing
59
ORDER adopting and affirming 53 Recommendation. To the extent Plaintiff seeks an extension of time to respond to the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation, his 57 Motion for Order is denied. Defendants Zalman and Van Dyke are dismissed without prejudice. To the extent that Plaintiff seeks another copy of his complaint, the Court grants his 57 Motion for Order. The Clerk shall mail Plaintiff a copy of his 29 Third Amended Complaint including all attachments, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/28/2010.(wjc, )
|
May 3, 2010 |
Filing
52
MINUTE ORDER granting 50 Defendants Motion for Order for a Determination that No Response Is Required on Plaintiffs Complaint Filed on September 15, 2009, Defendants Answers 42 & 45 , which include responses from the newly-sued parties, are the operative responses to the operative pleadings. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/3/2010.(erv, )
|
April 5, 2010 |
Filing
46
ORDER denying without prejudice 34 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying 34 Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must file any Motion for Leave to Amend his Complaint on or before May 7, 2010, and must include his propos ed Amended Complaint as an attachment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Prisoner Complaint form and a copy of the Third Amended Complaint currently on file 29 and all attachments thereto. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/2010.(erv, )
|
February 23, 2010 |
Filing
40
ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 29 Third Amended Complaint, filed by Jose Medina Escobar by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/23/2010. (erv, )
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing
33
ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 29 Third Amended Complaint, filed by Jose Medina Escobar by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/11/2010. (erv, ) (Modified on 2/19/2010 corrected file date)(erv, ).
|
February 9, 2010 |
Filing
27
MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to file the Second Amended Complaint Docket No. 9 , together with page 2 of Docket No. 21 and Docket No. 21-2, as a separate document entitled Third Amended Complaint. The Clerk shall also amend the caption of this action to include the names of Defendants added by Plaintiff in this Motion. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/9/2009.(erv, )
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing
18
ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/21/2009. (wjc, )
|
December 17, 2009 |
Filing
15
ORDER ASSIGNING CASE. This case shall be assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/17/2009. (sah, )
|
December 15, 2009 |
Filing
13
ORDER to Discharge Show-Cause Order 10 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/15/09. (jjh, )
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
8
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/22/09. (jjh, )
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing
4
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/22/09. (jjh, )
|