USA v. $5,565.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $5,565.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2009cv02212
Filed: September 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Eagle
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981 Civil Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER accepting 30 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Answer and Enter Judgment. Judgment shall enter in favor of the United States of America forfeiting to it $5,565.00 in United States currency, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 10/20/10.(ebs, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Status Conference - Claimant Still Missing. Status Conference set for 3/4/2010 is RESET to 5/6/2010 09:45 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/2/2010. (mehcd)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate (and Reset) Status Conference. Status Conference set for 1/7/2010 is RESET to 3/4/2010 09:45 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/6/2010. (mehcd)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Status Conference. Status Conference reset for 1/7/2010 09:45 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/30/09.(ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $5,565.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: James Sandy Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,565.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?