De Leon v. Marcos et al
Plaintiff: Ferdinand De Leon
Defendant: Imelda R. Marcos, Ferdinand R. Marcos and Denman Investment Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02216
Filed: September 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 USCA ORDER Denying petitioner's request for a writ of mandamus re: 97 Letter by Ferdinand De Leon. USCA case no. 10-1488. (bjrsl, )
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CORRECTED OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS 11 . This Opinion corrects an omission that was included in the original version found on the Court's docket 89 . The original version is thus WITHDRAWN in favor of this corrected version. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/23/10. (msklc2, )
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Minute Entry for Motions Hearing held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/25/2010. 39 Motion to Certify Class is DENIED; The Report and Recommendations 52 re 41 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory is ADOPTED; 57 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. The Court dismisses Claim 1 of the Complaint. Claim No. 2 now stands as a request for declaratory judgment. (Court Reporter Paul Zuckerman) (mskcd)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/14/09. (msksec, ) Modified on 12/15/2009 to edit text date of hearing (wjc, ).
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants Imelda Marcos and Ferdinand Marcos. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/12/2009. (mehcd)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 17 Denman Investment Corporation, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Discovery and Vacate Scheduling Conference Pending Disposition of its Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/09/2009.(wjc, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service. Plaintiff may serve the Summons and Complaint in this matter upon Imelda R. Marcos and Ferdinand R. Marcos via Federal Express. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/2/2009. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Leon v. Marcos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferdinand De Leon
Represented By: Richard G. Sander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imelda R. Marcos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferdinand R. Marcos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denman Investment Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?