Weisner v. Community Justice Services
Plaintiff: James A. Weisner
Defendant: Community Justice Services
Case Number: 1:2009cv02234
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/23/2010. (erv, )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/14/09. (cbssec)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 11/17/2009, at 10:45 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/15/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisner v. Community Justice Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Weisner
Represented By: Dipak Purushottam Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Justice Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?